BRITISH SOCIETY FOR HISTOCOMPATIBILITY AND IMMUNOGENETICS

Charity number: 1123760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £69.63k £83.60k £66.27k £87.61k £70.66k
Total expenditure £68.78k £74.55k £70.73k £97.59k £68.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A