Trustees VISION REDBRIDGE CULTURE AND LEISURE

Charity number: 1122720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Denis Solder Chair
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF BOYS' AND GIRLS' CLUBS
Received: On time
FRENFORD YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
NORTH AVENUE YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
Cllr Zulfiqar Hussain Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Saira Yasar Jamil Mrs Trustee 04 June 2021
None on record
Caroline Janet Ward Trustee 21 June 2016
None on record
Stephen John Wilks Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
LINDA PERHAM Trustee 25 May 2011
THAMES WATER TRUST FUND
Received: On time
CATHERINE JANE ROWAN Trustee 25 May 2011
REDBRIDGE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Received: On time
KEVIN JON PITTMAN Trustee 25 May 2011
None on record
DAVID CHARLES THOROGOOD Trustee 25 May 2011
None on record
BRIAN SPINKS Trustee
None on record