CHRIST'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1120090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download