CHRIST'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1120090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £26.70m £24.89m £41.65m £50.05m £35.98m
Total expenditure £27.49m £24.65m £36.56m £32.97m £33.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £6.89k £1.09m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.80m £3.17m £4.99m £3.32m £2.82m
Income - Other trading activities £5.00k £12.00k £1.28m £1.48m £228.00k
Income - Charitable activities £22.61m £20.49m £12.69m £13.44m £11.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £53.00k £28.00k £135.00k
Income - Investment £229.00k £225.00k £10.05m £12.37m £8.47m
Income - Other £1.05m £996.00k £12.69m £19.46m £13.40m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £3.20m £1.22m £808.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £27.49m £24.64m £31.52m £27.93m £27.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.00k £6.00k £2.76m £5.04m £5.55m
Expenditure - Governance £94.00k £126.00k £260.00k £232.00k £182.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £4.00k £6.00k £1.66m £1.60m £2.42m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £2.28m £0 £0