CHRIST'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1120090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Judy Evans Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Diana Garnham Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Prem Babu Goyal Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Nicholas Atkinson Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Nicholas Bensted-Smith Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Robert Wallace Muir Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Miriam McKay Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN STEANE Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
DELVA PATMAN Trustee
ST. CLEMENT DANES FUND Received: On time
ST CLEMENT DANES CHURCH FUND Received: On time
AIR VICE-MARSHAL ROBERT JUDSON Trustee 16 June 2015 None on record
MARIANNE BERNADETTE FREDERICKS Trustee 01 September 2017
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON CHARITY Received: On time
JOHN MARK YEOMANS Trustee 01 September 2019
ONEBILLION LEARNERS Received: 58 days late
Jan Tadeusz deWalden Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Thomas Garnier Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
JAMES MACLEAN Trustee 05 March 2015
BLUECOAT SPORTS Received: On time