Trustees Northants Community Aid

Charity number: 1120895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN PAUL ADAMS Chair 20 November 2017
UNITY LEISURE
Received: On time
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SPORT
Received: On time
Sam Sayer Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Tracy Whittaker-Smith Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Paul Green Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Paul Leslie Bone Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
valerie Patricia Bridges Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
ROBERT JOHN WALDER Trustee 21 November 2017
None on record
Satish Chauhan Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
Kathryn Julie Ozlati Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record