Trustees WHEELS FOR WELLBEING

Charity number: 1120905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suswati Basu Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Thomas Andrew Mark STANIFORD Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Kamran Mallick Trustee 12 December 2017
LLOYDS BANK FOUNDATION FOR ENGLAND & WALES
Received: On time
LYRIC THEATRE HAMMERSMITH LIMITED
Received: On time
KEVIN JONATHAN HICKMAN Trustee 22 October 2014
None on record
Lucy Swanson Trustee 07 March 2014
None on record
Anthony Fincham Trustee 07 March 2014
None on record
JUDY FINK Trustee 24 January 2012
DISABILITY ADVICE SERVICE LAMBETH
Received: On time
MAI-LING SAVAGE Trustee 23 January 2012
None on record
DAVID CHARLES STRONG Trustee
None on record