AYESHA COMMUNITY EDUCATION

Charity number: 1121317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 October 2020 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 October 2020 95 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 July 2016 14 June 2017 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2017 15 days late Download