Trustees WOODHOUSE COMMUNITY HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1120929
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
mark woodland | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Manjit Darby MBE | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rod Darby | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Taylor | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Michalska | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Woodland | Trustee | 19 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Starbucks | Trustee | 19 April 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.