OLDHAM ATHLETIC COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1120894
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £5.80k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £148.97k £102.00k
Other income £216.20k £225.87k £229.77k £116.18k £197.59k
Total expenditure £176.38k £212.65k £242.41k £275.39k £305.15k