CENTRE FOR THEOLOGY AND COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1121648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download