Trustees GOLDEN-OLDIES

Charity number: 1121600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Wann Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
John Franklin Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
Alwyn Humphreys MBE Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr ROGER BULLOCK Trustee 20 July 2016
RESEARCH IN SPECIALIST AND ELDERLY CARE
Received: On time
CHRISTINE Gregory Trustee 20 July 2016
None on record
John Crick Trustee 20 July 2016
None on record
SUSANNE MARIE CRICK Trustee 13 August 2015
None on record
Dr AFRODITI STATHI Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL THOMAS RICHARDSON Trustee
None on record