BAMESSILAH UK

Charity number: 1122372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £4.10k £18 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.92k £1.93k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A