Financial history HEART TO HELP

Charity number: 1122658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £42.63k £17.94k £30.34k £40.04k £58.07k
Total expenditure £42.77k £17.61k £22.08k £24.87k £71.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A