WOOTTON AND DRY SANDFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1121899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £75.45k £78.91k £76.76k £78.71k £83.82k
Total expenditure £100.24k £92.02k £96.82k £104.38k £83.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.12k N/A N/A