HACKNEY MIGRANT CENTRE

Charity number: 1122363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £187.34k £280.63k £366.72k £403.77k £435.32k
Total expenditure £169.85k £244.22k £304.79k £338.27k £375.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A