HACKNEY MIGRANT CENTRE

Charity number: 1122363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rosemary Sales Trustee 21 September 2017 None on record
MARK PALFRAMAN Trustee
LONDON CATALYST Received: On time
RAYAH ARIANE FELDMAN Trustee None on record
Hannah Elizabeth Ward Trustee 14 May 2015 None on record
Katherine Meade Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Hannah Rymer McConnachie Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
John Roy Hiscock Trustee 19 March 2015 None on record
Elizabeth Olubukola Kolawole-Johnson Trustee 06 April 2020 None on record