INTERNATIONAL ACTION FOR IRAQI REFUGEES

Charity number: 1123863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/01/2016 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020
Total gross income £77.18k £8.94k £11.97k £592 £5.55k
Total expenditure £24.12k £17.30k £19.17k £36 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A