SCHOOLS NORTHEAST

Charity number: 1129594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £247.67k £247.68k £188.56k £524.12k £491.07k
Total expenditure £161.06k £219.82k £194.35k £503.67k £431.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £397.55k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £126.57k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £238.93k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £264.73k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £4.39k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A