ST JOSEPH'S NURSERY

Charity number: 1123537
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £131.35k £141.48k £148.32k £166.04k £159.54k
Total expenditure £160.57k £140.58k £146.85k £145.16k £154.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £101.91k £103.83k £115.49k £134.36k £138.68k