NEWCASTLE UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1124896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MARSHALL Chair 23 January 2012 None on record
Shola Ameobi Trustee 16 October 2020 None on record
Michelle Percy Trustee 08 June 2020 None on record
Michael Roger Thompson Trustee 30 April 2018
THE GREGGS FOUNDATION Received: On time
Brian Thorpe Trustee 06 February 2015 None on record
Lee Charnley Trustee 15 April 2014 None on record
CLAIRE ALEXANDER Trustee 11 February 2016 None on record
Stephen Harper Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record
Graeme Mason Trustee 21 July 2017 None on record