Accounts and annual returns MONTGOMERY COMMUNITY BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1125054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 15 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required