THE NATIONAL SKILLS ACADEMY FOR SPORT AND ACTIVE LEISURE

Charity number: 1127431
Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £2.34m £263.98k £304.78k £225 £0
Total expenditure £2.58m £263.78k £69.00k £56.21k £34.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £24.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.30m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £21.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.58m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A