THE NATIONAL SKILLS ACADEMY FOR SPORT AND ACTIVE LEISURE

Charity number: 1127431
Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alex De Carvalho Trustee 10 May 2017 None on record
Joan Scott Trustee 01 January 2017
SKILLS ACTIVE UK
ANITA CACCHIOLI Trustee 12 January 2015 None on record
STEPHEN BADDELEY Trustee 12 January 2015 None on record
SUKHJINDER SINGH KALIRAI Chair 06 March 2012 None on record
William Ian Shaw Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
LADY MARGUERITE HUNTER BLAIR Trustee 27 March 2014 None on record
MARK LAVINGTON Trustee 06 March 2012
THE INSTITUTE FOR OUTDOOR LEARNING Received: On time