OXFORD UNITED IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1125173
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 June 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 January 2018 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 15 January 2018 169 days late Download