LEICESTER CITY FOOTBALL CLUB TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1126526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £693.41k £1.04m £1.00m £1.53m £1.62m
Total expenditure £569.42k £832.98k £937.55k £1.30m £1.50m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £39.71k £59.28k £104.74k £124.73k £89.57k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £653.70k £979.33k £896.15k £1.41m £1.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £569.42k £832.98k £937.55k £1.30m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.86k £30.42k £32.27k £33.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0