LEICESTER CITY FOOTBALL CLUB TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1126526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARVIND MICHAEL KAPUR Chair 07 January 2016
THE NATIONAL FOREST COMPANY Received: On time
WARNING ZONE LIMITED Received: On time
NATIONAL SPACE CENTRE Received: 26 days late
Julia Hewson Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Susan Whelan Trustee 28 June 2013
VICHAI SRIVADDHANAPRABHA FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
THE IRELAND FUND OF GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
John Byrne Trustee 03 July 2014 None on record
JONATHAN ROBERT RUDKIN Trustee 28 June 2013 None on record
Andrew Beddow Trustee 28 April 2017 None on record