Financial history THE STAINES PARISH COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1131827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.22k £26.57k £26.66k £9.83k £8.07k
Total expenditure £27.89k £23.62k £32.34k £15.73k £8.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £2.52k N/A N/A N/A