Trustees THE STAINES PARISH COMMUNITY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1131827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Patricia Matthews Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Cambray Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Kim Jane Lansdowne Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Trudy Girdler Trustee 05 March 2021
None on record
The Venerable Richard Stephen Frank Trustee 07 April 2020
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN
Received: On time
Rev Jonathan Aptin Samadi Trustee 26 September 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY AND SAINT PETER, STAINES
Received: On time
Dr Mobin Salahuddin Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Sinead Mooney Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
Geraldine Rita Forster Trustee
MIDDLESEX COUNTY ASSOCIATION OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
MR JOHN O'HARA Trustee
None on record