SOUTHWARK REFUGEE COMMUNITIES FORUM

Charity number: 1132229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 November 2019 281 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late Download