SOUTHWARK REFUGEE COMMUNITIES FORUM

Charity number: 1132229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yohannes Sibhatu Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record
Pauline Jennifer Nandoo Trustee 23 February 2017 None on record
VEJDAN EFRAVI Chair 01 December 2011 None on record
Faisal Maramazi Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Manuel Pierre Oliver Monade Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Nihaya Al-Othmani Trustee 10 September 2020 None on record