THE OUTWARD BOUND TRUST

Charity number: 1128090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 18 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time Download