THE OUTWARD BOUND TRUST

Charity number: 1128090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Lisa Kramer Trustee 03 January 2014 None on record
Dr Nick Gair, MBE Trustee 03 January 2014 None on record
Youlande Harrowell Trustee 21 June 2021 None on record
IAN CAMPBELL ASHMAN Trustee 22 April 2013 None on record
Nicholas James Sanderson Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
HRH Princess Beatrice Elizabeth Mary of York Trustee 11 March 2019 None on record
LEO HOULDING Trustee 20 March 2017
COMMUNITY ACTION NEPAL Received: On time
CHARLES EDWARD LAURENCE PHILIPPS Chair 21 June 2011
OUTWARD BOUND GLOBAL Received: On time
PAUL MARCUS GEORGE VOLLER Trustee 12 March 2018
CCHF ALLABOUTKIDS Received: On time
Jonathan Wayne Lewis Trustee 14 December 2017
WALTHAMSTOW HALL Received: On time
Mr Fasha Mahjoor Trustee 06 December 2014 None on record
ANDREW MARTIN CARTWRIGHT Trustee 12 March 2018
THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR ASIAN AFFAIRS Received: On time
Guy Hampson Williams Trustee 19 March 2014 None on record
Christine Mary Walker Trustee 07 December 2015 None on record
COLIN JAMES MAUND Trustee 23 July 2012
OUTWARD BOUND GLOBAL Received: On time