THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY

Charity number: 1127861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £127.67k £276.43k £157.46k £178.38k £113.71k
Total expenditure £191.50k £201.08k £214.72k £212.51k £123.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A