THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY

Charity number: 1127861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Kirsten Johnson Chair 24 September 2016 None on record
John Quaye Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
Tim Eccleshall Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Professor GAIA SCERIF Trustee 27 September 2014 None on record
Rosemary Martin Trustee 12 October 2019 None on record
Dr Lucia Elghali Trustee 27 September 2014 None on record
Tim Clarkson Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
katherine Zwink Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
Andrew Jaques Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
Steve Harris Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Mark Smith Trustee 23 September 2017 None on record
Andy Clarke Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Anne Eccleshall Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
Marie Williams Trustee 24 September 2016 None on record
Mary Martin Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record