BELVOIR CRICKET & COUNTRYSIDE TRUST

Charity number: 1131442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £119.73k £120.79k £193.81k £257.54k £138.05k
Total expenditure £137.99k £114.55k £178.58k £166.28k £109.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £2.00k £2.25k N/A £1.20k