BELVOIR CRICKET & COUNTRYSIDE TRUST

Charity number: 1131442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Clowes Trustee 26 March 2015 None on record
Derek Brewer Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
Alistair Anthony James Troughton Trustee 26 March 2015 None on record
Peter Stephens Trustee 08 October 2018 None on record
COLIN POVEY Trustee 29 February 2016 None on record
Jamie Dalrymple Trustee 20 January 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID PATON Trustee 16 November 2011 None on record
VERONICA PICKERING Trustee 31 December 2018
THE KAREN GREEN FOUNDATION Received: On time
NEW PERSPECTIVES THEATRE COMPANY Received: On time
EMMA AGNEW Trustee None on record
OLIVER HENRY JAMES STOCKEN CBE Trustee 16 November 2011
ARUNDEL CASTLE CRICKET FOUNDATION Received: On time
BELVOIR CASTLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
David Epton Trustee 03 March 2021 None on record
STEPHEN PETER HENDERSON Trustee None on record
Nicholas Turner Trustee 20 January 2014
THE ST JAMES'S CONSERVATION TRUST LTD. Received: On time
John Chatfeild-Roberts Chair 20 January 2014
THE MACLAREN FOUNDATION Received: On time
ROBERT HUDSON'S ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
THE MACLAREN TRUST Received: On time
Stephen Andrew Taylor Trustee 26 March 2015 None on record
PHILLIP HODSON Trustee None on record
PHILLIP PAUL O'BRIEN Trustee None on record