EDUCATION WEST AFRICA

Charity number: 1130223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £15.03k £10.79k £29.86k £34.24k £7.80k
Total expenditure £19.21k £2.89k £29.59k £34.24k £9.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A