Trustees THE EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Caroline Glendinning Chair 06 November 2019
THE ROYAL UNITED KINGDOM BENEFICENT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Anna Elizabeth Bennett Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
Hazel Batchelor Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
Justine Bianza Mutombo Trustee 06 November 2020
None on record
Jeremie Bidwaya Diatapakola Trustee 06 November 2020
None on record
John Fitzgerald Kennedy Afriyie Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
John Tyrrell Trustee 10 July 2017
None on record
CATH MAFFIA Trustee 04 November 2013
None on record
COLIN TAYLOR Trustee
None on record