ST ANNE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1142660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £13.62m £12.91m £13.67m £13.07m £11.21m
Total expenditure £11.14m £11.34m £12.00m £13.23m £10.97m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.16m £2.13m £2.77m £1.46m £1.47m
Income - Other trading activities £945.00k £1.19m £837.00k £946.00k £410.00k
Income - Charitable activities £7.94m £7.81m £8.26m £8.76m £7.34m
Income - Endowments £137.00k £225.00k £791.00k £183.00k £44.00k
Income - Investment £1.64m £1.69m £1.71m £1.83m £1.58m
Income - Other £76.00k £97.00k £91.00k £83.00k £405.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £954.00k £370.00k £148.00k £101.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.68m £9.57m £10.34m £11.53m £9.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £725.00k £904.00k £964.00k £968.00k £958.00k
Expenditure - Governance £58.00k £49.00k £50.00k £58.00k £58.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £23.00k £210.00k £217.00k £228.00k £227.00k
Expenditure - Other £731.00k £872.00k £693.00k £727.00k £360.00k