ST ANNE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1142660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

61 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Banbrook Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
PROF JO-ANNE BAIRD Trustee 04 December 2012 None on record
Professor PETER JEAVONS Trustee 30 June 2011
OXFORD CHRISTADELPHIANS Received: On time
Professor MARTYN HARRY Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
DR Graham Nelson Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
Prof Alex Rogers Trustee 05 October 2015 None on record
Professor David Murray Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor PATRICK MCGUINNESS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor Geraldine Hazbun Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor ANDREW BRIGGS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr SIAN GRONLIE Trustee 30 June 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES' OXFORD Received: On time
Professor DON PORCELLI Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor Bent Flyvbjerg Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Prof Stuart Robinson Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record
Professor KATE WATKINS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr JONATHAN KATZ Trustee 14 June 2017 None on record
Clare White Trustee 07 March 2016 None on record
Dr ROBERT CHARD Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
DR DMITRY BELYEAV Trustee 04 December 2012 None on record
Professor Christopher Holmes Trustee 11 March 2015 None on record
Dr Sonia Clegg Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
Professor Kristen Kreider Trustee 02 December 2020 None on record
Professor TERRY LYONS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr Samina Khan Trustee 05 October 2015 None on record
JOHN FORD Trustee 05 October 2016
THE LEE OLD CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
Professor ALAN COCKS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr BUDIMIR ROSIC Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
PROF Paresh Vyas Trustee 04 December 2012 None on record
Professor PETER WILSHAW Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor DAVID PYLE Trustee 05 October 2016 None on record
Dr Shannon McKellar Trustee 07 October 2015 None on record
Prof Charlotte Deane Trustee 05 October 2015 None on record
Professor SARAH WATERS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor NEIL MACFARLANE Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr ANDREW KLEVAN Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor PATRICK IRWIN Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor ROGER CRISP Trustee 30 June 2011
INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR UTILITARIAN STUDIES Received: On time
Prof Sarah Wordsworth Trustee 28 November 2014 None on record
Dr Todd Hall Trustee 21 January 2014 None on record
Professor CHRISTOPHER GROVENOR Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor MATTHEW REYNOLDS Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor NEVILLE HARNEW Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor HOWARD HOTSON Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr Helen Christian Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor Julia Hippisley-Cox Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Professor BEN HAMBLY Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor Matthew Leigh Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
PETER GHOSH Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Dr Imogen Goold Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Helen King Chair 24 April 2017 None on record
Dr Freya Johnston Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Edwin John Victor Drummond Trustee 10 March 2021 None on record
Dr Simon Park Trustee 14 June 2017 None on record
Dr Johannes Abeler Trustee 04 December 2012 None on record
Prof Victoria Murphy Trustee 12 October 2015 None on record
Professor Francis Szele Trustee 30 June 2011 None on record
Professor Roger Reed Trustee 03 December 2014 None on record
Dr Tim Schwanen Trustee 05 October 2015 None on record
Professor ANTONIOS TZANAKOPOULOS Trustee 21 January 2014
INTERNATIONAL LAW ASSOCIATION Received: 13 days late
Dr Maxim Bolt Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
Professor Yaacov Yadgar Trustee 14 June 2017 None on record