Financial history ACTS 435

Charity number: 1131305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £330.34k £463.54k £518.33k £689.44k £1.05m
Total expenditure £329.23k £460.32k £511.07k £617.36k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £518.33k £689.40k £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £47 £8
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £496.58k £587.84k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £14.49k £29.52k £14.03k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.44k £4.37k £61.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0