COLLEGE OF CORPUS CHRISTI AND OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £10.16m £9.94m £10.58m £10.53m £10.50m
Total expenditure £9.65m £10.27m £10.46m £12.13m £10.57m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.20m £1.72m £906.97k £1.50m £791.98k
Income - Other trading activities £1.18m £1.23m £1.28m £905.77k £1.05m
Income - Charitable activities £4.95m £5.18m £5.27m £5.35m £4.64m
Income - Endowments £313.65k £1.34m £491.27k £966.53k £374.51k
Income - Investment £2.83m £2.90m £3.14m £3.64m £3.76m
Income - Other £314.18k £244.67k £466.37k £102.23k £636.05k
Income - Legacies £99.09k £25.59k £32.41k £52.11k £39.85k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.89m £8.29m £8.40m £10.14m £8.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.30m £1.40m £1.46m £1.36m £1.50m
Expenditure - Governance £47.77k £55.52k £50.61k £44.49k £54.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £157.87k £172.27k £165.52k £200.21k £180.17k
Expenditure - Other £454.52k £593.02k £600.78k £632.42k £756.81k