THE SOCIETY OF INTERNATIONAL ECONOMIC LAW

Charity number: 1133176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £45.94k £12.60k £14.53k £8.87k £9.12k
Total expenditure £34.77k £10.81k £25.01k £19.22k £9.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A