1 2 3 SOLEIL

Charity number: 1132936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTELLE ASHCROFT Trustee 26 September 2013 None on record
Anne Marie LANG Trustee 25 June 2019 None on record
Aurelie Obadia Trustee 14 December 2014 None on record
Francois-Xavier CADINOUCHE Trustee None on record
SOPHIE FLORENCE WARD Chair None on record
Fabienne Martinez Trustee 14 December 2014 None on record
Damien O'JEANSON Trustee 22 May 2018 None on record
YASMINA NORVAL Trustee 24 November 2011 None on record