GOOLE AND SELBY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134348
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

83 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nancy Simpson Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Christine Scott Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
DAVID MARK SAMPLE Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
MICHAEL PARKINSON Trustee None on record
Ellen Anne Raper Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
OLIVE MOODY Trustee None on record
Rev Christine Gillespie Trustee 01 March 2019 None on record
Margaret Rosamund Skilbeck Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
SHIRLEY CLAYBOURN Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Kathryn Margaret Lonsdale Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
Hazel Curry Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
CHRISTINE SUMPNER Trustee None on record
Carole Moran Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Rev Philip Macdonald Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
MARGARET ADDERLEY Trustee 23 February 2014
HOWDEN CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
EAST YORKSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES
Eileen Carlin Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
JOHN LAYCOCK Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
CHRISTINE JOAN CRAGGS Trustee None on record
Myrtle Boldan Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Lydia Jane Harrison Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
JOY MARGARET PIPER Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Susan Florence Laverack Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Jame Green Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
DAVID EDWARD HARDAKER Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Sylvia Parkin Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
Fiona Richards Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
NIGEL ALLAN CURREY Trustee 01 September 2014
SELBY & DISTRICT FOODBANK Received: On time
Margaret Jean Wilby Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
JOYCE GILL Trustee None on record
ANGIE BENTLEY Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Freda Young Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
Nargaret Marshall Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
CLIFF BROOK Trustee None on record
Kenneth Leslie Johnson Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
AUDREY BROOME WESTABY Trustee None on record
Dorothy Jean Falkingham Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
BARBARA MURIEL HIND Trustee None on record
Mr John Baarda Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
MARTIN JULIAN PASCOE Trustee 02 February 2012 None on record
PAM DORSEY Trustee None on record
DAVID WILLIAM SPENCER SIMPSON Trustee None on record
Georgina Wilks Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
ROGER ALAN PIPE Trustee None on record
LAWRENCE STUART LAYCOCK Trustee None on record
Catherine Avril Staton Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
PAUL WESTON Trustee None on record
Gerald Malcolm Holmes Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Sheila Grace Duck Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
Janet Tetley Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Christine Acrid Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
CHRISTINE ANNETTE GAMBLE Trustee None on record
IRENE TOMLINSON Trustee None on record
GEOFFREY WILLIAM TAYLOR Trustee 02 February 2012 None on record
SARAH MARGARET HENDERSON Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
ANDREW GEOFFREY PATRICK Trustee None on record
CHRISTINE LEONARD Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
BARBARA MORRIS Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Martin Sommers Wakefield Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
JACQUELINE GAITLEY Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
JANET ROSEMARY CLARK Trustee
NORTH DUFFIELD AND SKIPWITH PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION Received: On time
JOHN PHILIP SMITH Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Elizabeth Ann Baarda Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
James Martin Acrid Trustee 23 February 2014 None on record
EILEEN CLARKSON Trustee 01 September 2014
TADCASTER METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN WHITE Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
DAVID ALAN JONES Trustee None on record
Rachel Barnes Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
PAT PARKER Trustee None on record
REV PETER ARTHUR BARNETT BA Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Howard David Croft Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
ALLISON GUEST Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
JANET PEACOCK Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Ann Wood Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
MARION LOUISE ROBINSON Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
JILL CHIRSTINE SERVICE Trustee None on record
Brenda Oldfield Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Hilary Jean Walker Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
FIONA MARGARET FENTON Trustee None on record
TONY GAMBLE Trustee None on record
MALCOLM BOTT Trustee None on record
HELEN VIRGINIA HALL Trustee
SYPCO Received: On time
THE GIFTS OF HOPE TRUST Received: On time
SUSAN EASTWOOD Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
MICHAEL CURRY Trustee None on record