UNIVERSITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON STUDENTS’ UNION

Charity number: 1136470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.09m £1.04m £1.05m £1.08m £1.23m
Total expenditure £1.07m £1.19m £1.04m £1.10m £1.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £886.67k £891.75k £892.12k £956.37k £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £130.51k £80.90k £95.48k £82.91k £60.09k
Income - Charitable activities £63.12k £61.20k £64.04k £40.57k £24.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.21k £2.04k £2.03k £2.78k £2.28k
Income - Other £4.10k £3.00k £878 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £924.34k £933.19k £950.50k £976.79k £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £147.72k £96.64k £89.55k £125.51k £112.93k
Expenditure - Governance £7.66k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £155.32k £0 £0 £0