UNIVERSITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON STUDENTS’ UNION

Charity number: 1136470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Bishop Trustee 26 October 2015 None on record
Tayabah Mahmood Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Omoriawo Idiakheua Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Veronica Leigh-Hanson Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Chetan Bhatti Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Angel Morphew Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Oluwatobi Falana Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Joshua Fejiro Eyitemi Oke Trustee 18 February 2021 None on record
Bilgin Yuksel Trustee 08 February 2019 None on record
Olalere Bamigbade Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record