Trustees FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

38 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Anthony Guy Malcolm Chair 01 February 2019
None on record
Millicent Freeman Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Jojo N Monney Trustee 27 February 2022
None on record
Phyllis Anne Lloyd Trustee 01 September 2021
THE WALTHAMSTOW CIRCUIT TRUST
Received: On time
GRAHAM GEORGE BURGESS Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev Stephanie Njeru Trustee 21 July 2021
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Elvena Bernita Brumant Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
Gordon Trevor Lumer Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
Andronica Mugombe Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Gary Ian Marshall Trustee 06 October 2019
STONEWOOD CAMP TRUST
Received: On time
Jill Geddes Trustee 19 September 2019
LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Leslie Victor Stowe Trustee 19 September 2019
WALTHAM FOREST UNIT 347 OF THE SEA CADET CORP
Received: On time
Lincoln Everard Fearon Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Sharon Theresa Heather Trustee 19 September 2019
EPPING FOREST FOODBANK
Received: On time
Jean Norton Trustee 19 September 2019
THE CHINGFORD DISTRICTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES
Received: On time
Patricia Ann Bott Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Robert Amey Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Hazel Ann Mathews Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Joseph Appiah Kusi Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Rev Armstrong K Fummey Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Rev Dr Jongikaya Zihle Trustee 01 September 2019
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
STEPHEN WILLIAM MURRAY Trustee 01 September 2019
EPPING FOREST DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
LOUGHTON MEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
OAKWOOD SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB
Received: On time
Loyl Marcia Brandt Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Carole Dorothy Merriman Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Kathleen Rhoda Poole Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Hannah Roberts Trustee 01 September 2018
THE LONDON WELSH CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
APPLECARTLIVE LTD
Received: On time
THE WALTHAMSTOW CIRCUIT TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Susan Jane Creighton Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Pat Evans Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
REV Hilary Cheng Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
PATRICIA OVENDEN Trustee 01 March 2013
None on record
REV OSEIAS DA SILVA Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
MARTIN HOWARTH Trustee 01 March 2012
THE LOUGHTON AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
CHRISTIAN DRAMA RESOURCE CENTRE
Received: On time
FLORESTINE CORBETT Trustee
None on record
DALLION ROYE Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN HIGGINS Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE OKPATTAH Trustee
None on record
BERNARD MANSELL Trustee
None on record
JANET ELIZABETH TWEEDALE Trustee
THE WALTHAMSTOW CIRCUIT TRUST
Received: On time