Trustees THE PARK THEATRE

Charity number: 1137223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Clare Chair 18 January 2022
None on record
Jonathan Edwards Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record
Professor Kurt Barling Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
Hedda Rachel Beeby Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
Julia Tyrrell Trustee 19 January 2021
None on record
Rufus Olins Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
BHARAT MEHTA Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
VICTORIA MARY PHILLIPS Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Andrew Cleland-Bogle Trustee 20 July 2016
None on record
Joanne Marie Parker Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record